EP0376615 - Method of improving the fluidity of a liquid-crystal resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/27] | Liquid-crystal resin composition having improved fluidity | ||
[1997/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD. 3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD. 3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakai, Mikio 885-11, Miyajima Fuji-shi Shizuoka / JP | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter, et al Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Jackson, Peter, et al HYDE, HEIDE & O'DONNELL 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313396.7 | 20.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | JP19880330129 | 27.12.1988 Original published format: JP 33012988 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376615 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376615 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376615 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/00, C08L77/12, C08L81/00, C09K19/38 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C09K19/3809 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/38 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L77/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08L67/04, C08L67/00 (US,EP);
C08L77/12, C08L2666/18 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Fliessfähigkeit von flüssigkristallinen Harzzusammensetzungen | [1997/13] | English: | Method of improving the fluidity of a liquid-crystal resin composition | [1997/13] | French: | Procédé pour améliorer la fluidité de compositions résineuses cristaux liquides | [1997/13] |
Former [1990/27] | Flüssigkristalline Harzzusammensetzung mit verbesserter Fliessfähigkeit | ||
Former [1990/27] | Liquid-crystal resin composition having improved fluidity | ||
Former [1990/27] | Composition résineuse à cristal liquide ayant une fluidité modifiée | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.1997 | BE | 26.03.1997 | CH | 26.03.1997 | ES | 26.03.1997 | FR | 26.03.1997 | GR | 26.03.1997 | IT | 26.03.1997 | LI | 26.03.1997 | SE | 26.06.1997 | LU | 20.12.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
CH | 26.03.1997 | ||
ES | 26.03.1997 | ||
GR | 26.03.1997 | ||
IT | 26.03.1997 | ||
LI | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
FR | 22.08.1997 | ||
LU | 20.12.1997 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
CH | 26.03.1997 | ||
ES | 26.03.1997 | ||
GR | 26.03.1997 | ||
IT | 26.03.1997 | ||
LI | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
FR | 22.08.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
CH | 26.03.1997 | ||
GR | 26.03.1997 | ||
IT | 26.03.1997 | ||
LI | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
FR | 22.08.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
CH | 26.03.1997 | ||
IT | 26.03.1997 | ||
LI | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
FR | 22.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
CH | 26.03.1997 | ||
LI | 26.03.1997 | ||
SE | 26.06.1997 | ||
FR | 22.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
CH | 26.03.1997 | ||
LI | 26.03.1997 | ||
FR | 22.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
FR | 22.08.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 26.03.1997 | |
BE | 26.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 26.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0044176 (CELANESE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0093333 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]GB2158832 (DART IND INC); | [A]EP0168503 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4611025 (AKKAPEDDI MURALI K [US], et al); | [Y]WO8809802 (AMOCO CORP [US]) | Examination | - ENCYCLOPEDIA OF POLYMER SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, Vol. 14, pages 665-666, John Wiley & Sons, 1988 |