EP0376653 - Non-attritive method for making polyester, polycarbonate or polyamide particles, particles obtainable by the method and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1990/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nield, Eric 3 Dell Lees Seer Green Beaconsfield HP9 2UJ / GB | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Cooper, Alan Victor, et al Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough, Berkshire SL2 5DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Cooper, Alan Victor, et al Patents and Trade Marks Section Legal Affairs Department ICI Paints Wexham Road Slough, Berkshire SL2 5DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313523.6 | 22.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | GB19880030072 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8830072 | GB19880030074 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8830074 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376653 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376653 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/14, C08J9/28, C09D7/12, B05D1/00, // C08L67/02, C08L69/00, C08L77/00 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
B05D7/14 (EP,US);
C03C17/32 (EP);
C03C17/324 (EP);
C08J3/14 (EP);
C08J9/28 (EP);
C09D5/03 (EP);
C09D7/65 (EP,US);
C09D7/68 (EP);
C09D7/69 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Polyester-, Polykarbonat- oder Polyamidteilchen ohne Zerreibung, die so erhaltenen Teilchen und ihre Anwendung | [1990/27] | English: | Non-attritive method for making polyester, polycarbonate or polyamide particles, particles obtainable by the method and their use | [1990/27] | French: | Procédé pour préparer des particules de polyester, de polycarbonate ou de polyamide sans attrition, particules obtenues par le procédé et leur application | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 03.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/53] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62057424 ; | [X]GB740356 (POLYMER CORP); | [X]DE2253361 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [X]DE2335876 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG); | [X]US4078916 (GERBER ARTHUR H, et al); | [A]EP0027176 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [X]EP0171603 (AKZO GMBH [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, part 22, 30th November 1987, page 60, abstract no. 199779s, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 057 424 (SHINTO PAINT CO., LTD) 13-03-1987, & JP62057424 A 00000000 |