EP0324695 - Hair roller for permanent waving [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERMA Société Anonyme 29bis, rue d'Astorg F-75384 Paris Cédex 08 / FR | [1989/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Froger, Hubert 49 Boulevard Diderot F-75012 Paris / FR | 02 /
Petit, Rémi 144 Impasse Rollon F-76230 Bois Guillaume / FR | [1989/29] | Representative(s) | Le Brusque, Maurice, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | Le Brusque, Maurice, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 21, rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/29] | Bérogin, Francis CABINET HARLE & PHELIP 21, rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400108.0 | 12.01.1989 | [1989/29] | Priority number, date | FR19880000279 | 12.01.1988 Original published format: FR 8800279 | [1989/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324695 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324695 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A45D4/14, A45D4/16, A45D6/10 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
A45D4/14 (EP);
A45D2/122 (EP);
A45D4/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/29] | Title | German: | Haarwickler für Dauerwellen | [1989/29] | English: | Hair roller for permanent waving | [1989/29] | French: | Bigoudi pour ondulations permanentes | [1989/29] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.03.1993 | ES | 24.03.1993 | GB | 24.03.1993 | GR | 24.03.1993 | NL | 24.03.1993 | SE | 24.03.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 24.03.1993 | |
GB | 24.03.1993 | ||
GR | 24.03.1993 | ||
NL | 24.03.1993 | ||
SE | 24.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 24.03.1993 | |
GB | 24.03.1993 | ||
NL | 24.03.1993 | ||
SE | 24.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | GB | 24.03.1993 | |
NL | 24.03.1993 | ||
SE | 24.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/51] | NL | 24.03.1993 | |
SE | 24.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/46] | SE | 24.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2109632 (PIERRE ATHENS); | [A]FR1414774 (CALOR APP ELECTRO DOMESTIQUES); | [AD]US3250895 (MCNAIR SAMUEL L); | [A]US3476121 (FOLEY NORMAN G); | [A]DE1929812 (GOLD ZACK WERKE AG); | [AD]DE2551379 (WERDING WINFRIED JOSEF) |