EP0325540 - Aromatic esters and thioesters, process for their preparation and their use in human or animal therapeutics and in cosmetics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE INTERNATIONAL DE RECHERCHES DERMATOLOGIQUES GALDERMA - CIRD GALDERMA Sophia Antipolis F-06560 Valbonne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states CENTRE INTERNATIONAL DE RECHERCHES DERMATOLOGIQUES GALDERMA - CIRD GALDERMA Sophia Antipolis F-06560 Valbonne / FR | ||
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states CENTRE INTERNATIONAL DE RECHERCHES DERMATOLOGIQUES C.I.R.D. Groupement d'Intérêt Economique dit: Sophia Antipolis F-06560 Valbonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shroot, Braham Villa 35 Hameaux de Val Bosquet Chemin de Val Bosquet F-06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
Eustache, Jacques 42, avenue Alphonse Daudet F-06130 Grasse / FR | 03 /
Bernardon, Jean-Michel 21, Chemin Plan Bergier Le Rouret F-06650 Nice / FR | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard, et al CABINET NONY & CIE 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400162.7 | 19.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | LU19880087109 | 20.01.1988 Original published format: LU 87109 | [1989/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325540 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325540 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/92, C07C67/14, C07C327/20, C07C235/42, C07D265/30, A61K31/235, A61K31/255, A61K7/48, A61K7/06 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
C07C69/92 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1989/30] | C07C69/92, C07C67/14, C07C153/11, C07C103/78, C07D265/30, A61K31/235, A61K31/255, A61K7/48, A61K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | Aromatische Ester und Thioester, ihr Herstellungsverfahren und ihre Anwendung in der Human- oder Tiermedizin und in der Kosmetik | [1989/30] | English: | Aromatic esters and thioesters, process for their preparation and their use in human or animal therapeutics and in cosmetics | [1989/30] | French: | Esters et thioesters aromatiques, leur procédé de préparation et leur utilisation en médecine humaine ou vétérinaire et en cosmétique | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Eléments de la technique relevés: néant. |