EP0332483 - Nozzle for assisting orifice,device incorporated therein and method for method for carrying out [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESUVIUS FRANCE S.A. 68, rue de la Gare F-59750 Feignies / FR | [1989/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanse, Eric 8 rue de Baisieux B7370 Elouges / BE | 02 /
Rancoule, Gilbert 1 Mitchell Grant Way Bedford ma 01730 / BE | [1989/37] | Application number, filing date | 89400411.8 | 14.02.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | FR19880002407 | 26.02.1988 Original published format: FR 8802407 | [1989/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0332483 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332483 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D41/08 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
B22D1/005 (EP,US);
B22D41/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1989/37] | Title | German: | Ausgussdüse zur unterstützenden Oeffnung,Vorrichtung,die sie beinhaltet,und Verfahren zur Durchführung | [1989/37] | English: | Nozzle for assisting orifice,device incorporated therein and method for method for carrying out | [1989/37] | French: | Busette de coulée pour ouverture assistée,dispositif l'incorporant et procédeé de mise en oeuvre | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE österreichische Magnesit Aktiengesellschaft A- 9545 Radenthein / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | 02
20.10.1992
24.11.1992
ADMISSIBLE Didier-Werke AG Lessingstrasse 16 Postfach 20 25 D-65010 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Brückner, Raimund Didier-Werke AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE österreichische Magnesit Aktiengesellschaft A- 9545 Radenthein / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 40882 Ratingen / DE | ||
02
20.10.1992
24.11.1992
ADMISSIBLE Didier-Werke AG Lessingstrasse 16 Postfach 20 25 D-65010 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Brückner, Raimund c/o Didier-Werke AG Hauptverw./Patentabt. Postfach 2025 Lessingstrasse 16-18 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [1992/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE österreichische Magnesit Aktiengesellschaft A- 9545 Radenthein / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | ||
02
20.10.1992
24.11.1992
ADMISSIBLE Didier-Werke AG Lessingstrasse 16 Postfach 20 25 D-65010 Wiesbaden / DE Opponent's representative Brückner, Raimund c/o Didier-Werke AG Hauptverw./Patentabt. Postfach 2025 Lessingstrasse 16-18 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [1992/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1992
07.07.1992
ADMISSIBLE österreichische Magnesit Aktiengesellschaft A- 9545 Radenthein / AT Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Eisenhüttenstrasse 2 D-40882 Ratingen / DE | 22.06.1992 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 03.07.1992 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 29.10.1992 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 20.11.1992 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 30.11.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.07.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.02.1993 | SE | 15.02.1993 | BE | 28.02.1993 | [1994/09] |
Former [1994/02] | GB | 14.02.1993 | |
SE | 15.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | SE | 15.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1368390 (STOECKER & KUNZ GMBH); | [A]EP0059805 (ATO JUNICHI); | [A]US3838798 (VOSS W) |