EP0331549 - Process for the preparation of 4,4-dibromobiphenyl in a solvent medium and with a catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Desmurs, Jean-Roger La Jonquière Route de Ternay Communay F-69360 Saint Symphorien D'Ozon / FR | 02 /
Nonn, Alain 1, Allée de la Gravière F-69110 Sainte Foy les Lyon / FR | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Dubruc, Philippe, et al Rhone-Poulenc Chimie Service Brevets Chimie 25 Quai Paul-Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Dubruc, Philippe, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul-Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400417.5 | 15.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | FR19880002608 | 02.03.1988 Original published format: FR 8802608 | [1989/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331549 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C25/18, C07C17/12 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
C07C17/12 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/12, C07C25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 4,4-Dibrombiphenyl in einem Lösungsmittel und in Gegenwart eines Katalysators | [1989/36] | English: | Process for the preparation of 4,4-dibromobiphenyl in a solvent medium and with a catalyst | [1989/36] | French: | Procédé de préparation du dibromo-4,4' biphényle en milieu solvant et avec catalyseur | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/04] | 02.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/04] | Request for further processing for: | 09.11.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP8064532 ; | [X]US3763248 (MITCHELL L) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 19, 10 novembre 1980, page 621, no. 185926t, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-80 64 532 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO. LTD) 15-05-1980, & JP8064532 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 82, no. 3, 20 janvier 1975, page 464, no. 16426x, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.V. MEDOKS et al.: "Bromination of biphenyl", & ISSLED. MAT., FIZ., KHIM. 1973, 124-7 |