EP0330574 - Transport vehicle with laterally mobile loading arms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARREL Zone Industrielle Sud F-42160 Andrézieux-Bouthéon / FR | [1992/24] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states BENNES MARREL Zone Industrielle Sud F-42161 Andrézieux-Bouthéon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lambert, Bernard Les Charmes Chevagny Les Chevrières F-71960 Pierreclos / FR | 02 /
Chalavon, Jacques Les Chatons Rue du Chemin Vert F-42340 Veauche / FR | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400507.3 | 23.02.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | FR19880002243 | 24.02.1988 Original published format: FR 8802243 | [1989/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0330574 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330574 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/48 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
B60P1/483 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/35] | Title | German: | Transportfahrzeug mit seitlich bewegbaren Ladearmen | [1989/35] | English: | Transport vehicle with laterally mobile loading arms | [1989/35] | French: | Véhicule de transport à bras de chargement latéralement mobiles | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 11.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.1992 | ES | 22.04.1992 | GR | 22.04.1992 | IT | 22.04.1992 | NL | 22.04.1992 | SE | 22.04.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 22.04.1992 | |
GR | 22.04.1992 | ||
IT | 22.04.1992 | ||
NL | 22.04.1992 | ||
SE | 22.04.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 22.04.1992 | |
IT | 22.04.1992 | ||
NL | 22.04.1992 | ||
SE | 22.04.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 22.04.1992 | |
NL | 22.04.1992 | ||
SE | 22.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 22.04.1992 | |
SE | 22.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | SE | 22.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1387688 (BIL CITY I PITEA AB); | [Y]EP0089614 (PRODUCT GROUP J V [US]); | [Y]EP0220560 (WILCKE HANS) |