EP0336794 - Apparatus for analyzing and sampling of liquid effluents coming from an industrial installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jonca, Henri Valentin Jean 30, Boulevard Jean Brunhes F-31300 Toulouse / FR | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1989/41] | Application number, filing date | 89400671.7 | 10.03.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | FR19880003286 | 14.03.1988 Original published format: FR 8803286 | [1989/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0336794 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0336794 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/14 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
G01N1/14 (EP);
G01N33/18 (EP);
G01N2001/185 (EP);
G01N2001/2064 (EP);
G01N2001/2071 (EP);
G01N21/534 (EP);
G01N21/85 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1989/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Analyse und Probenentnahme von aus industriellen Anlagen strömenden Flüssigkeiten | [1989/41] | English: | Apparatus for analyzing and sampling of liquid effluents coming from an industrial installation | [1989/41] | French: | Appareil pour l'analyse et la prise d'échantillons sur des effluents liquides issus d'une installation industrielle | [1989/41] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 21.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2570824 ; | [Y]US4151086 ; | [A]FR2264278 ; | [A]DE2641801 ; | [A]US3015957 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 48 (E-106), 24th April 1979 & JP A 5425789 |