EP0335789 - Simplified automatic blood analysis system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melet, Francois 9, Chaussée Jules César F-95520 Osny / FR | [1989/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400852.3 | 24.03.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | FR19880004021 | 28.03.1988 Original published format: FR 8804021 | [1989/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0335789 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335789 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/12 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
G01N15/12 (EP);
G01N1/38 (EP);
G01N2001/382 (EP);
G01N2015/011 (EP);
G01N2015/012 (EP);
G01N2015/016 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/40] | Title | German: | Vereinfachter automatischer Blutanalysator | [1989/40] | English: | Simplified automatic blood analysis system | [1989/40] | French: | Analyseur hématologique automatique simplifié | [1989/40] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/52: Teilanmeldung 92109676.4 eingereicht am 24/03/89 | EPB 1992/52: Divisional application 92109676.4 filed on 24/03/89 | EPB 1992/52: Demande divisionnaire 92109676.4 déposée le 24/03/89 | Examination procedure | 18.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 06.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92109676.4 / EP0510722 | EP92109677.2 / EP0508495 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.04.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   18.05.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.1992 | GR | 23.12.1992 | NL | 23.12.1992 | SE | 23.12.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/25] | AT | 23.12.1992 | |
NL | 23.12.1992 | ||
SE | 23.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | NL | 23.12.1992 | |
SE | 23.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | NL | 23.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3549994 (ROTHERMEL WILLIAM F, et al); | [A]US3887868 (GUGGENBUHL WALTER); | [A]US4070617 (KACHEL VOLKER, et al) |