EP0336815 - Hopper with flexible walls and a reduced loading height [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.1992 [1992/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NODET-GOUGIS 5 Boulevard du Général-Leclerc B.P. 36 F-77130 Montereau / FR | [1989/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coulmont, Philippe 5 rue Pierre Brosselette F-77130 Montereau / FR | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/41] | Bérogin, Francis c/o CABINET HARLE & PHELIP 21 rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400862.2 | 28.03.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | FR19880004457 | 05.04.1988 Original published format: FR 8804457 | [1989/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0336815 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65G67/24, B65D88/62, B65D88/16 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
B65D90/021 (EP);
B65D88/28 (EP);
B65D88/62 (EP);
B65G47/18 (EP);
B65G47/20 (EP);
B65G67/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/41] | Title | German: | Schütttrichter mit flexiblen Seitenwänden und reduzierter Ladehöhe | [1989/41] | English: | Hopper with flexible walls and a reduced loading height | [1989/41] | French: | Trémie à flanc déformable et hauteur de chargement réduite | [1989/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 10.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/17] | 26.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE1531853 ; | [YD]US4541765 ; | [Y]FR2050224 ; | [Y]FR1542425 ; | [A]DE1229902 |