EP0341098 - Pneumatic fruit press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS GREGOIRE S.A. 89, avenue de Barbezieux Chateaubernard F-16100 Cognac / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS GREGOIRE S.A. 89, avenue de Barbezieux Chateaubernard F-16100 Cognac / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gregoire, James 89, avenue de Barbezieux F-16100 Cognac / FR | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Rodhain, Claude, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Rodhain, Claude, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/01] | Kügele, Bernhard NOVAPAT-CABINET CHEREAU 63 bis, boulevard Bessières F-75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/45] | Kügele, Bernhard NOVAPAT-CABINET CHEREAU 63 bis, boulevard Bessières F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400884.6 | 30.03.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | FR19880004761 | 11.04.1988 Original published format: FR 8804761 | [1989/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341098 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341098 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B30B9/22 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
B30B9/22 (EP,US);
B30B9/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [1989/45] | Title | German: | Pneumatische Obstpresse | [1989/45] | English: | Pneumatic fruit press | [1989/45] | French: | Pressoir pneumatique | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/19] | 27.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.1992 | CH | 31.03.1993 | ES | 31.03.1993 | LI | 31.03.1993 | [2004/37] |
Former [1994/46] | AT | 30.12.1992 | |
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | CH | 31.03.1993 | |
LI | 31.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2499464 (HOWARD MACHINERY LTD [GB]); | [X]FR2529135 (WILLMES JOSEF GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3243105 (WILLMES JOSEF GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3440558 (QUETSCH KARL HEINZ) |