EP0336838 - Method and apparatus for polishing an optical component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERTIN & CIE Zone Industrielle Boîte postale 3 F-78373 Plaisir Cédex / FR | [1992/02] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states BERTIN & CIE B.P. No. 73 F-78373 Plaisir Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Volat, Jean-Pierre 29 Rue Irma Moreau F-13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel, et al Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89400932.3 | 05.04.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | FR19880004519 | 06.04.1988 Original published format: FR 8804519 | [1989/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0336838 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0336838 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B24B13/06 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
B23Q1/5481 (EP,US);
B24B13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/41] | Title | German: | Polierverfahren und -vorrichtung für einen optischen Gegenstand | [1989/41] | English: | Method and apparatus for polishing an optical component | [1989/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de polissage d'un composant optique | [1989/41] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 11.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1938004 (ITEK CORP); | [A]US3769762 (MAYO M); | [A]FR2365409 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]); | [A]FR2448417 (INST KOSM I [SU]) | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 21, no. 3, 1 février 1982, pages 561-564, Optical Society of America, New York, US; R.A. JONES: "Segmented mirror polishing experiment" | [A] - OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 22, no. 2, mars-avril 1983, pages 236-240, Society of Photo-Optical Instrumentation Engineers, Bellingham, Washington, US; R.A. JONES: "Computer-controlled polishing of telescope mirror segments" | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 26, no. 12, 15 juin 1987, pages 2421-2486, Optical Society of America, New York, US; G. DOUGHTY et al.: "Microcomputer-controlled polishing machine for very smooth and deep aspherical surfaces" | [A] - N.T.I.S. TECH NOTES, no. 12, partie F, décembre 1985, page 1375, Springfield, Virginia, US; "Programed optical surfacing equipment" |