EP0340099 - Manufacturing process for memory cards comprising graphic elements, and cards obtained by this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès F-92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mollet, Jean Paul 47, Elysée 2 F-78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | 02 /
Rose, René 15, rue de l'Etang F-78190 Voisin le Bretonneux / FR | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1989/44] | Dronne, Guy SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès F-92120 Montrouge / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401172.5 | 25.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | FR19880005671 | 28.04.1988 Original published format: FR 8805671 | FR19880012088 | 16.09.1988 Original published format: FR 8812088 | [1989/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0340099 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/06 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
G06K19/07724 (EP,US);
B29C45/14647 (EP,US);
B29C45/14688 (EP,US);
B29C45/14827 (EP,US);
G06K19/07745 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren von Speicherkarten mit graphischen Elementen und Karten, die nach diesem Verfahren hergestellt sind | [1989/44] | English: | Manufacturing process for memory cards comprising graphic elements, and cards obtained by this process | [1989/44] | French: | Procédé de réalisation de cartes comportant des éléments graphiques et cartes obtenues par ledit procédé | [1989/44] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1998/02] | 28.02.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/02] | Appeal following examination | 10.07.1992 | Appeal received No. T0935/92 | 11.09.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.12.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | 28.04.1997 | Appeal received No. T0824/97 | 14.10.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Request for further processing for: | 07.10.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60146383 ; | [A]JP6086850 ; | [A]GB2081974 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG); | [A]GB2096541 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG); | [A]LU81049 (RUWA BELL SARL [FR]); | [APD]EP0267826 (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]); | [APD]EP0277854 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 320 (P-413)(2043) 14 décembre 1985, & JP-A-60 146383 (DAINIPPON INSATSU K.K.) 02 août 1985,, & JP60146383 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 230 (E-343)(1953) 17 septembre 1985, & JP-A-60 86850 (DAINIPPON INSATSU K.K.) 16 mai 1985,, & JP6086850 A 00000000 |