EP0342097 - Method and apparatus for the purification of rinsing bath after brightening and for recovery of the brightening acids contained in these rinsing baths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE RECHERCHES TECHNIQUES ET INDUSTRIELLES (SRTI) 283, rue de la Minière 78530 Buc / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE RECHERCHES TECHNIQUES ET INDUSTRIELLES (SRTI) 283, rue de la Minière F-78530 - BUC / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fremeaux, Pierre Thomson - CSF SCPI - CEDEX 67 F-92045 Paris La Défense / FR | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Phan, Chi Quy, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1989/46] | Application number, filing date | 89401225.1 | 28.04.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | FR19880006347 | 11.05.1988 Original published format: FR 8806347 | [1989/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0342097 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C23F3/00, C02F1/26 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
C02F1/26 (EP);
C23F3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Spülbäderreinigung nach der Glanzerzeugung und für die Wiedergewinnung der Säuren für die Glanzerzeugung, die diese Spülbäder enthalten | [1989/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for the purification of rinsing bath after brightening and for recovery of the brightening acids contained in these rinsing baths | [1989/46] | French: | Procédé et installation pour purifier des bains de rinçage après brillantage et pour récupérer les acides de brillantage que ces bains de rinçage contiennent | [1989/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 17.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/30] | 01.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1571949 ; | [Y]US3956464 ; | [A]DE1952104 ; | [A]GB1345710 ; | [A]US4117092 ; | [A]US4083758 |