EP0341161 - Automatic machine for distributing and fitting rings on combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENAULT AUTOMATION Centre PARLY II Boite Postale 70 78152 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | For all designated states SOCIETE BROCHOT 42 à 56, boulevard de la République F-93190 Livry Gargan / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states RENAULT AUTOMATION Centre PARLY II Boite Postale 70 F-78152 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states SOCIETE BROCHOT 42 à 56, boulevard de la République F-93190 Livry Gargan / FR | |||
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
For all designated states BUREAU D'ETUDE DE MECANIQUE (B.E.M.) 60, rue du Landy F-93210 La Plaine-Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maron, Lionel 22, avenue de la Division Leclerc F-93000 Bobigny / FR | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Srour, Elie, et al RENAULT TECHNOCENTRE Département Propriété Intellectuelle Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36 1, avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Srour, Elie, et al REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT (S. 0804) 8 & 10 Avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1989/45] | Saint Martin, René Régie Nationale des Usines Renault 8 & 10, avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401267.3 | 03.05.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | FR19880006060 | 05.05.1988 Original published format: FR 8806060 | [1989/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341161 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341161 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23P19/08 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
B23P19/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/45] | Title | German: | Automatische Maschine zum Verteilen und Setzen von Ringen auf Verbrennungsmotorkolben | [1989/45] | English: | Automatic machine for distributing and fitting rings on combustion engines | [1989/45] | French: | Machine automatique de distribution et de pose des segments sur les pistons de moteurs thermiques | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU916220 ; | [A]US4212096 ; | [A]US4084727 | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, semaine K06, 23 mars 1983, section P/Q, classe P56, no. B 9688K/06, Derwent Publications Ltd, Londres, GB; & SU-A-916 220 (V.A. GRAF) 27-03-1986, & SU916220 A 00000000 |