EP0348251 - Liquid absorbant of acid gases containing a tertiary alcanolamin compound and an absorption activator for CO2 and its use for the deacidification of CO2 and possibly other acid gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF AQUITAINE PRODUCTION Tour Elf 2 Place de la Coupole La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states ELF AQUITAINE PRODUCTION Tour Elf 2 Place de la Coupole La Défense 6 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE (PRODUCTION) Tour Elf, 2, Place de la Coupole, La Défense 6 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE (PRODUCTION) Tour Elf 2, Place de la Coupole La Défense 6 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peytavy, Jean-Louis 5 Lotissement Darrouzet Bougarber F-64230 Lescar / FR | 02 /
Le Coz, Philippe Rue de La Prairie Cidex 49 C Poey de Lescar F-64230 Lescar / FR | 03 /
Oliveau, Olivier Allée des Près F-64230 Lescar / FR | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Boillot, Marc Elf Exploration Production Département Propriété Industrielle Tour Elf EP/T/RD/DPI - Bureau 34 G 47 92078 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Boillot, Marc Elf Aquitaine Production Département Propriété Industrielle Tour Elf Cédex 45 F-92078 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [1989/52] | Boillot, Marc ELF AQUITAINE Division Propriété Industrielle Tour Elf F-92078 Paris la Défense Cédex 45 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401397.8 | 23.05.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | FR19880006881 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: FR 8806881 | FR19880006880 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: FR 8806880 | FR19880016130 | 08.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8816130 | [1989/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348251 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348251 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0348251 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
B01D53/1493 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1989/52] | Title | German: | Flüssiges Absorptionsmittel für saure Gase mit einer tertiären Alkanolaminkomponente und einem CO2-Absorptionsaktivator, seine Anwendung zur Entsäuerung von CO2 enthaltendem Gas und möglicherweise anderen sauren Gasen | [1989/52] | English: | Liquid absorbant of acid gases containing a tertiary alcanolamin compound and an absorption activator for CO2 and its use for the deacidification of CO2 and possibly other acid gases | [1989/52] | French: | Liquide absorbant des gaz acides renfermant une composante alcanolamine tertiaire et un activateur d'absorption du CO2 et son application à la désacidification de gaz contenant CO2 et éventuellement d'autres gaz acides | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/52] | 24.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.1994
03.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Geissler, Bernhard Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.1994
03.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Geissler, Bernhard Bardehle Pagenberg Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.1994
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 26.01.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.08.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.08.1995 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.12.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.05.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0160203 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0080817 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [A]US4217236 (SARTORI GUIDO [US], et al); | [A]DE2551717 ; | [A]DE3601283 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]); | [A]DE2746913 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0033401 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]); | [A]WO8605474 (PARSONS CO RALPH M [US]); | [AD]US4336233 (APPL MAX, et al); | [A]GB2167397 (SNAM PROGETTI); | [A]DE2815447 (LINDE AG); | [A]US4238206 (HONG CHARLES C [US]); | [A]US4696803 (NIEH EDWARD C Y [US]); | [AP]US4775519 (YIT NIEH EDWARD C [US]); | [A]US4624838 (PAN YEN-CHI [US], et al) |