EP0344054 - Tape drive device for a magnetic recorder, and recorder provided with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean Jaurès F-92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abeille, Pierre 26, rue des Prés F-92160 Antony / FR | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1994/18] |
Former [1991/27] | Dupont, Henri Schlumberger Industries Centre de Recherches SMR 50, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 620-05 F-92542 Montrouge Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1989/48] | Ritzenthaler, Jacques SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES CENTRE DE RECHERCHE/SMR B.P. 620-05 F-92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401399.4 | 23.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | FR19880006994 | 26.05.1988 Original published format: FR 8806994 | [1989/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344054 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344054 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/43, G11B15/26, G11B15/61 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
G11B15/61 (EP,US);
G11B15/26 (EP,US);
G11B15/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Bandantriebsvorrichtung für ein magnetisches Aufnahmegerät und Aufnahmegerät mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [1989/48] | English: | Tape drive device for a magnetic recorder, and recorder provided with such a device | [1989/48] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement de bande pour enregistreur magnétique et enregistreur pourvu d'un tel dispositif | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.05.1994 | SE | 04.05.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 04.05.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2004405 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]US3231668 (YOSHIRO NISHIWAKI, et al); | [A]GB901620 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]FR2130346 (RCA CORP); | [A]DE3003225 (PAPST MOTOREN KG); | [A]US3423541 (WADA YOSHIYO); | [A]US3612376 (JOHNSON DELMAR R); | [A]US4096533 (JENKINS JOHN P); | [A]FR2519789 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) |