EP0348257 - (Hetero)aryl-diazole derivatives, process for their preparation and their therapeutical use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DELALANDE S.A. 32, rue Henri Regnault F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1989/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Milcent, René 6, rue Cavendich F-75019 Paris / FR | 02 /
Lebreton, Luc 2, rue Pierre Loti Bât B. F-78600 Maisons Laffitte / FR | 03 /
Mazouz, Fathi 5, avenue du Docteur Tenine F-92160 Antony / FR | 04 /
Burstein, Claude 21, avenue du Bois Brandin F-60580 Coye la Forêt / FR | 05 /
Gueddari, Salah 5, chemin des Bas Heurts F-93160 Noisy le Grand / FR | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Kedinger, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Kedinger, Jean-Paul, et al c/o Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401445.5 | 26.05.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | FR19880007114 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: FR 8807114 | [1989/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348257 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348257 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D257/04, C07D271/10, C07D285/12, C07D401/04, C07D403/06, C07C121/75, C07C133/00, C07C161/00, A61K31/41 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
C07D257/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D271/113 (EP,US);
C07D285/125 (EP,US);
C07D285/13 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | (Hetero)Aryl-diazol-Derivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung in der Therapie | [1989/52] | English: | (Hetero)aryl-diazole derivatives, process for their preparation and their therapeutical use | [1989/52] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés d'(hétéro)aryl diazole, leur procédé de prépation et leur application en thérapeutique | [1989/52] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/18] | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3453285 (HAYAO SHIN); | [Y]US3865570 (GEORGE EDWIN FRANCIS, et al); | GB1163355 [ ] (BORG WARNER [US]); | [A]FR1084633 (MAY & BAKER LTD); | [AP]EP0270061 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 71, No. 11, 15 septembre 1969, page 386, resume No. 49857q, Columbus, Ohio, US; T.R. VAKULA et al.: "1,3,4-oxa(orthia)diazoles. III. Mannich bases and some related products derived from 5-substituted-1,3,4-oxadiazole-2-thiones", & Indian J. Chem. 1969, 7(6), 583-7 |