EP0345160 - Liquid metal cooled fast neutron nuclear reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lemercier, Guy 67, avenue de la Bourgade F-13610 Le Puy Sainte Reparade / FR | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1989/49] | Application number, filing date | 89401504.9 | 01.06.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | FR19880007354 | 02.06.1988 Original published format: FR 8807354 | [1989/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0345160 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G21C11/08, G21C15/12 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
G21C11/088 (EP);
G21C15/12 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1989/49] | Title | German: | Flüssigmetallgekühlter Kernreaktor mit schnellen Neutronen | [1989/49] | English: | Liquid metal cooled fast neutron nuclear reactor | [1989/49] | French: | Réacteur nucléaire à neutrons rapides, refroidi par un métal liquide | [1989/49] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 05.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/31] | 02.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0265311 (NOVATOME [FR]); | [A]EP0020264 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]EP0067103 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]FR2425129 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) |