EP0348268 - Method for installing between floor and ceiling a partition panel, and sole rail for such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.09.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 27.10.1993 [1993/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLACOPLATRE 20, rue Victorien-Sardou 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states PLACOPLATRE 20, rue Victorien-Sardou F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funten, Marc 59 Rue Alexandre Rivot F-77290 Metry-le-Neuf / FR | 02 /
Rivaud, André 29 Rue Alphonse Manceau F-77360 Vaires S/Marne / FR | 03 /
Hamelin, Yves 10 Place Koenig F-91000 Evry / FR | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401631.0 | 12.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | FR19880008437 | 23.06.1988 Original published format: FR 8808437 | [1989/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348268 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/78 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
E04B2/825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einbau einer Wandschale zwischen Boden und Decke und Sockelleiste zu dessen Ausführung | [1989/52] | English: | Method for installing between floor and ceiling a partition panel, and sole rail for such a method | [1989/52] | French: | Procédé pour l'établissement, entre sol et plafond, d'un panneau de cloison, et semelle propre à la mise en oeuvre d'un tel procédé | [1989/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/11] | 11.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/43] | 13.06.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2823216 (KNAUF WESTDEUTSCHE GIPS); | [Y]US4361994 (CARVER TOMMY L); | [Y]US4567699 (MCCLELLAN THOMAS A [CA]); | [A]US4621470 (BALINSKI HENRY A [US]) |