EP0347305 - [(Aryl-4-piperazinyl-1)-2-ethoxy]-3 p cymene, the ortho-, meta-, para-monosubstituted or disubstituted phenyl ring derivatives, process for their preparation and medicaments containing the same as the active principle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECHERCHES CHIMIQUES ET BIOLOGIQUES APPLIQUEES (I.R.C.E.B.A.) Société à responsabilité limitée dite: 62, Grande-Rue F-78490 Vicq / FR | [1989/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Houziaux, Patrick Chemin des Jonchères Bazemont F-78580 Maule / FR | 02 /
Lacolle, Jean-Yves 17 rue Charles de Gaulle F-78860 Saint Nom la Breteche / FR | 03 /
Riffaud, Jean-Pierre 108 Avenue des Etats Unis F-78000 Versailles / FR | 04 /
Danree, Bernard 53 rue des Grands Champs F-78300 Poissy / FR | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89401640.1 | 13.06.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | FR19880007864 | 13.06.1988 Original published format: FR 8807864 | [1989/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347305 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347305 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/08, A61K31/495, C07D295/10 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
C07D295/096 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
C07D295/088 (EP,US);
C07D295/112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/03] |
Former [1989/51] | ES, GR | Title | German: | [(Aryl-4-piperazinyl-1)-2-ethoxy]-3p-cymole, die ortho-, meta-, para-monosubstituierten oder disubstituierten Derivate, das Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und die als aktives Prinzip diese Verbindungen enthaltenden Arzneimittel | [1989/51] | English: | [(Aryl-4-piperazinyl-1)-2-ethoxy]-3 p cymene, the ortho-, meta-, para-monosubstituted or disubstituted phenyl ring derivatives, process for their preparation and medicaments containing the same as the active principle | [1989/51] | French: | [(Aryl-4-pipérazinyl-1)-2 éthoxy]-3 p-cymène, les dérivés ortho, méta, para monosubstitués ou disubstitués sur le noyau phényle dudit produit, le procédé de préparation desdits dérivés, et les médicaments contenant lesdits composés comme principe actif | [1989/51] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/04: Verbunden mit 89907194.8/0445116 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 06.12.91 | EPB 1992/04: Consolidated with 89907194.8/0445116 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 06.12.91 | EPB 1992/04: Jointe à la demande no. 89907194.8/0445116 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 06.12.91 | Examination procedure | 07.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.05.1993 | GR | 12.05.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 12.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0173634 (CORTIAL [FR]); | [A]EP0237411 (INST RECH CHIM BIOLOG [FR]) |