EP0359600 - Foldable loading platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERHEL 32, Avenue de Stalingrad F-21100 Dijon / FR | [1990/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Launay, Pierre Eugène Marie 20 Bld. de Troyes F-21240 Talant / FR | 02 /
Minois, Alain Résidence le Colombier 30A rue de Chanzy F-21100 Dijon / FR | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402121.1 | 26.07.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | FR19880011974 | 14.09.1988 Original published format: FR 8811974 | [1990/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359600 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/44 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
B60P1/445 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/12] | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbare Ladebordwand | [1990/12] | English: | Foldable loading platform | [1990/12] | French: | Perfectionnement aux hayons élévateurs repliables | [1990/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 05.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/38] | 21.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3228829 ; | [A]FR2438008 ; | [A]FR2140884 |