EP0356298 - Sound set, particularly a stereophonic one, for television apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE ELECTRONIQUE DE LA REGION PAYS DE LOIRE 74, rue du Surmelin F-75020 Paris / FR | [1990/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huerre, Dominique THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 02 /
Pissot, Guy THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1995/28] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1994/43] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1990/09] | Chaverneff, Vladimir THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402239.1 | 08.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | FR19880010914 | 16.08.1988 Original published format: FR 8810914 | [1990/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0356298 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356298 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/64 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
H04N5/642 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1990/09] | Title | German: | Tonanlage, besonders stereophonische, für Fernsehgerät | [1990/09] | English: | Sound set, particularly a stereophonic one, for television apparatus | [1990/09] | French: | Installation sonore, en particulier stéréophonique, pour téléviseur | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 27.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/21] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Request for further processing for: | 10.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 16.02.1996 | [2015/21] |
Former [1996/47] | GB | 15.11.1995 | |
DE | 16.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | DE | 16.02.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58101596 ; | [A]JP6051084 ; | [X]DE2806580 ; | [X]DE969637 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 204 (E-197)[1349], 9 septembre 1983, page 109 E 197; & JP-A-58 101 596 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 16-06-1983, & JP58101596 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 181 (E-331)[1904], 26 juillet 1985, page 23 E 331; & JP-A-60 51 084 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 22-03-1985, & JP6051084 A 00000000 |