EP0359607 - Central processing unit for a data-processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL S.A. Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states BULL S.A. Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keryvel, George 25, avenue de la Grande Armée F -75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Thomas, Jean-Louis 25, avenue de la Grande Armée F -75016 Paris / FR | 03 /
Timsit, Claude 25, avenue de la Grande Armée F -75016 Paris / FR | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Colombe, Michel, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA Poste courrier:LV 58F35 68 route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | Colombe, Michel, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA Poste courrier:LV 59C18 68 route de Versailles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | ||
Former [1990/30] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versailles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | ||
Former [1990/12] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie BULL S.A. Industrial Property Department P.C.: HQ 8M006 B.P. 193.16 121 avenue de Malakoff F-75764 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402243.3 | 09.08.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | FR19880010858 | 12.08.1988 Original published format: FR 8810858 | [1990/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0359607 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359607 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/76, G06F13/16, G06F15/16 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
G06F15/8092 (EP,US);
G06F13/1657 (EP,US);
G06F15/8007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/12] | Title | German: | Zentrale Datenverarbeitungseinheit für ein Datenverarbeitungssystem | [1990/12] | English: | Central processing unit for a data-processing system | [1990/12] | French: | Unité centrale pour système de traitement de l'information | [1990/12] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2536884 (RCA CORP [US]); | [A]EP0014926 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]); | [A]US3566363 (DRISCOLL GRAHAM C JR); | [A]EP0147857 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |