EP0360638 - Process for dyeing keratinous fibres with an indole derivative associated with a nitrite, and composition therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bore, Pierre 197 Avenue Daniel Perdrigé F-93370 Montfermeil / FR | 02 /
De Labbey, Arnaud 9, rue Charles Dordain F-93600 Aulnay-sous-Bois / FR | 03 /
Baudry, Alain 19 Villa du Buisson Ardent F-95500 Gonesse / FR | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89402311.8 | 21.08.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | LU19880087333 | 08.09.1988 Original published format: LU 87333 | [1990/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0360638 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
A61K8/492 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Färben keratinischer Fasern mit einem Indolderivat zusammen mit einem Nitrit und Präparat dazu | [1990/13] | English: | Process for dyeing keratinous fibres with an indole derivative associated with a nitrite, and composition therefor | [1990/13] | French: | Procédé de teinture des fibres kératiniques avec un dérivé d'indole associé à un nitrite et composition de mise en oeuvre | [1990/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/19] | 19.12.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0271186 |