EP0357505 - Articulated twin-engined bogie for rail vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.N.F. - INDUSTRIE Tour Aurore Place des Reflets Cédex 5 F-92080 Paris Défense 2 / FR | [1990/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neut, Daniel Demeure du Breuil 48 rue Auguste Renoir F-77380 Combes La Ville / FR | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Bertrand, Didier, et al c/o S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT & AUTRES CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRIELLE 38, Avenue Hoche F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402363.9 | 30.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | FR19880011394 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: FR 8811394 | [1990/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0357505 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B61F3/04, B61F5/38 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
B61F3/04 (EP);
B61F5/148 (EP);
B61F5/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/10] | Title | German: | Zweimotoriges Gelenkdrehgestell für Schienenfahrzeuge | [1990/10] | English: | Articulated twin-engined bogie for rail vehicles | [1990/10] | French: | Bogie bimoteur articulé pour véhicule ferroviaire | [1990/10] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/18] | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH279157 ; | [A]US2074340 ; | [A]FR1216018 ; | [A]DE2827112 ; | [A]WO8706550 |