EP0357507 - Superconducting article containing thallium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/10] | Superconducting article containing thallium, and method for producing the same | ||
[1996/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUPERCONDUCTOR TECHNOLOGIES INC. 460 Ward Drive Suite F Santa Barbara California 93111-2310 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states SUPERCONDUCTOR TECHNOLOGIES INC. 460 Ward Drive Suite F Santa Barbara California 93111-2310 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olson, William L. 388 Park Street Buellton California 94327 / US | 02 /
Eddy, Michael M. 22 San Rossano Drive Goleta California 93117 / US | 03 /
James, Timothy W. 4727 Calle Reina Santa Barbara California 93110 / US | 04 /
Robinson, McDonald 4053-D Foothill Road Santa Barbara California 93110 / US | 05 /
Hammond, Robert B. 309 Mesa Lane Santa Barbara California 93109 / US | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402365.4 | 30.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | US19880238919 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: US 238919 | US19890308149 | 08.02.1989 Original published format: US 308149 | [1990/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0357507 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0357507 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0357507 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01B12/00, H01L39/24, C04B35/00 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
C23C14/087 (EP);
H01P1/203 (EP);
H10N60/0521 (EP);
H10N60/0548 (EP);
H10N60/203 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/10] | Title | German: | Supraleitendes Erzeugnis enthaltend Thallium | [1996/10] | English: | Superconducting article containing thallium | [1996/10] | French: | Article supraconducteur contenant du thallium | [1996/10] |
Former [1990/10] | Supraleitendes Erzeugnis enthaltend Thallium und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1990/10] | Superconducting article containing thallium, and method for producing the same | ||
Former [1990/10] | Article supraconducteur contenant du thallium et procédé pour le fabriquer | Examination procedure | 12.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 28.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.03.1996 | BE | 06.03.1996 | CH | 06.03.1996 | ES | 06.03.1996 | GR | 06.03.1996 | IT | 06.03.1996 | LI | 06.03.1996 | NL | 06.03.1996 | LU | 31.08.1996 | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 06.03.1996 | |
BE | 06.03.1996 | ||
CH | 06.03.1996 | ||
ES | 06.03.1996 | ||
GR | 06.03.1996 | ||
IT | 06.03.1996 | ||
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
NL | 06.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 06.03.1996 | |
BE | 06.03.1996 | ||
CH | 06.03.1996 | ||
ES | 06.03.1996 | ||
GR | 06.03.1996 | ||
IT | 06.03.1996 | ||
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 06.03.1996 | |
BE | 06.03.1996 | ||
CH | 06.03.1996 | ||
GR | 06.03.1996 | ||
IT | 06.03.1996 | ||
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
LU | 31.08.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 06.03.1996 | |
BE | 06.03.1996 | ||
CH | 06.03.1996 | ||
IT | 06.03.1996 | ||
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 06.03.1996 | |
BE | 06.03.1996 | ||
CH | 06.03.1996 | ||
LI | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 06.03.1996 | |
BE | 06.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 06.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3191055 (SWIHART JAMES C, et al); | [A]DE2532570 ; | [Y]EP0277020 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]) |