EP0360650 - Clutch release mechanism, in particular for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen 75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen F-75848 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gay, Christian 8, rue de Prague F-80090 Amiens / FR | 02 /
Lassiaz, Philippe 18 rue d'Alsace F-92300 Levallois / FR | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Embrayages Propriété Industrielle Le Triangle 15 Rue des Rosiers 93585 Saint Ouen / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services, Service Propriété Industrielle, "Le Triangle", 15, rue des Rosiers F-93585 Saint-Ouen Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402401.7 | 04.09.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | FR19880012437 | 23.09.1988 Original published format: FR 8812437 | [1990/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0360650 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0360650 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/14 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
F16D23/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1990/13] | Title | German: | Kupplungsausrücklager, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1990/13] | English: | Clutch release mechanism, in particular for motor vehicles | [1990/13] | French: | Butée de débrayage, notamment pour véhicules automobiles | [1990/13] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 15.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2337281 (FERODO SA [FR]); | [A]FR2304828 (FERODO SA [FR]) |