EP0363239 - Localised destruction device for soft structures with negative pressure elastic waves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.1993 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDAP INTERNATIONAL Z.I. le Parc aux Vignes Rue des Vieilles Vignes F-77200 Croissy Beaubourg-Marne la Vallée / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states EDAP INTERNATIONAL Z.I. le Parc aux Vignes Rue des Vieilles Vignes F-77200 Croissy Beaubourg-Marne la Vallée / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dory, Jacques 91, rue des Molveaux F-77450 Coupvray / FR | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Marquer, Francis, et al Cabinet Moutard 35, Avenue Victor Hugo 78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Marquer, Francis, et al Cabinet Moutard 35, Avenue Victor Hugo F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402529.5 | 15.09.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | FR19880013094 | 06.10.1988 Original published format: FR 8813094 | [1990/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0363239 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0363239 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
A61N7/00 (EP);
A61B17/22004 (EP);
A61B2017/00154 (EP);
A61B2017/00163 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Gerät für lokalisierte Zertrümmerung von weichen Strukturen mittels elatischer Unterdruckwellen | [1990/15] | English: | Localised destruction device for soft structures with negative pressure elastic waves | [1990/15] | French: | Appareil de destruction localisée de structures molles au moyen d'ondes élastiques de pression négative | [1990/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 28.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/32] | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2187840 ; | [Y]EP0148653 ; | [A]GB2140693 |