EP0418445 - Apparatus for feeding a pasty mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.E.M.T.I. Société à Responsabilité Limitée Chemin de la Voute F-76120 Grand-Quevilly / FR | [1991/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Rodhain, Claude, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Rodhain, Claude, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402582.4 | 21.09.1989 | [1991/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418445 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/02, D21F1/06, D21F1/08 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
D21F1/02 (EP,US);
D21F1/028 (EP,US);
D21F1/06 (EP,US);
D21F1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zuführen einer Faserstoffaufschwemmung | [1991/13] | English: | Apparatus for feeding a pasty mixture | [1991/13] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en mélange pâteux | [1991/13] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/11] | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1429879 (BAILEY METER CO); | [Y]US3846229 (KALLMES O); | [A]FR2107699 (BRUDERHAUS MASCHINEN GMBH); | [A]FR1571410 ; | [A]DE3422846 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]US4604164 (FUJIWARA HARUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [E]FR2631353 (SEMTI [FR]) |