EP0368696 - Process for the industrial manufacture of sodium parahydroxymandelate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE FRANCAISE HOECHST TOUR ROUSSEL HOECHST 1 Terrasse Bellini 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states SOCIETE FRANCAISE HOECHST TOUR ROUSSEL HOECHST 1 Terrasse Bellini F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christidis, Yani 53 Boulevard de la Villette F-75019 Paris / FR | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402790.3 | 10.10.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | FR19880014575 | 08.11.1988 Original published format: FR 8814575 | [1990/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0368696 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368696 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/52, C07C51/367 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
C07C51/367 (EP,US);
C07C51/412 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/367, C07C59/52 (EP,US);
C07C51/412, C07C59/52 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur industriellen Herstellung von Natriumparahydroxymandelat | [1990/20] | English: | Process for the industrial manufacture of sodium parahydroxymandelate | [1990/20] | French: | Nouveau procédé de fabrication industrielle du parahydroxymandélate de sodium | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 21.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2427322 (HOECHST FRANCE [FR]); | [Y]EP0024181 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) | [Y] - HOUBEN-WEYL: METHODEN DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | JP55102537 | JP5461142 | - HOUBEN-WEYL: METHODEN DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, 4 édition, 1976, tome VI/Ic, 2. partie, page 1036, Georg Thieme Verlag Stuttgart, RFA | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 155 (C-29)(697), 29 octobre 1980; & JP-A-55 102 537, & JP55102537 A 00000000 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 83 (C-52), 28 juillet 1979; & JP-A-54 61 142, & JP5461142 A 00000000 |