EP0369864 - Process for producing aromatic amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nomura, Kotohiro 2-29-7, Ooike Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | 02 /
Ishino, Masaru 2-1-145, Kuwatacho Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567 / JP | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Bourgognon, Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Bourgognon, Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403095.6 | 09.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | JP19880293394 | 18.11.1988 Original published format: JP 29339488 | JP19890226930 | 31.08.1989 Original published format: JP 22693089 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0369864 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0369864 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369864 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/36, C07C221/00, C07C213/02, C07C253/30 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
C07C221/00 (EP,US);
C07C209/325 (EP,US);
C07C213/02 (EP,US);
C07C253/30 (EP,US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US);
C07C2603/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von aromatischen Aminen | [1990/21] | English: | Process for producing aromatic amines | [1990/21] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'amines aromatiques | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0097592 ; | [AD]US3944615 (IQBAL ABUL F M); | [A]US3293295 (SWAKON EDWARD A, et al) | [AD] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol. 21, 1980, pages 2603-2604, Oxford, GB; H. ALPER: "The ruthenium carbonyl catalyzed reduction of nitro compounds by phase transfer catalysis" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 26, 30 June 1986, page 759, abstract no. 236073t, Columbus, Ohio, US; G. CLAUTI et al.: "Carbonyl complexes of rhodium(I), iridium(I) and molybdenum(0) containing substituted derivatives of 1,10-phenanthroline and 2,2'-bipyridine", & INORG. CHIM. ACTA 1986, vol. 112, no. 2, pages 103 - 106 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 15, 9 April 1984, page 525, abstract no. 120303f, Columbus, Ohio, US; E. ALESSIO et al.: "Activation of hexarhodium hexadecacarbonyl with 1,10-phenanthroline and substituted derivatives in the catalytic reduction of nitrobenzene to aniline with carbon monoxide and water", & J. MOL. CATAL. 1984, vol. 22, no. 3, pages 327 -339 |