EP0375528 - Apparatus for manipulating a light-reflecting mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRECIACIER SA, Société Anonyme Rue de Pont - B.P. 10 58170 Luzy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states PRECIACIER SA, Société Anonyme Rue de Pont - B.P. 10 F-58170 Luzy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gautheron, François Cité Le Mattrait F-58170 Luzy / FR | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel, et al Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Bruder, Michel, et al Cabinet Bruder 46 Rue Decamps F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403515.3 | 15.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | FR19880016923 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8816923 | [1990/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375528 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/18 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B23K26/02 (EP);
G02B7/1815 (EP);
G02B7/1824 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1990/26] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Manipulierung eines lichtreflektierenden Spiegels | [1990/26] | English: | Apparatus for manipulating a light-reflecting mirror | [1990/26] | French: | Dispositif de manipulation d'un miroir réfléchissant la lumière | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 03.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/01] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4648692 ; | [A]US3642353 ; | [A]EP0237987 ; | [A]US3836236 |