EP0376841 - CD display case with protrusions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valin, Didier L'Hermitage Varennes F-36300 Le Blanc / FR | [1990/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Rodhain, Claude, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Rodhain, Claude, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403658.1 | 27.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | FR19880017216 | 27.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8817216 | [1990/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376841 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/04, G11B23/023 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G11B23/0236 (EP);
G11B33/0483 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, NL [1990/27] | Title | German: | Präsentationseinrichtung mit Spitzen für CD | [1990/27] | English: | CD display case with protrusions | [1990/27] | French: | Présentoir à picots pour disques compacts | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 01.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/53] | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4595098 ; | [X]EP0263227 ; | [A]EP0162999 ; | [A]BE395609 ; | [A]US4629067 ; | [A]DE3739897 ; | [AP]EP0334457 |