EP0350416 - Adhesives based on amorphous propylene/hexene copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.10.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | ||
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Godfrey, Darryl Aubrey c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/02] | Parent, Yves Kodak-Pathé Département Brevets et Licences Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420242.3 | 06.07.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | US19880215681 | 06.07.1988 Original published format: US 215681 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350416 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350416 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09J123/14 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
C09J123/142 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31801 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31902 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J123/142, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/08] |
Former [1992/36] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT | ||
Former [1990/02] | ES, GR | Title | German: | Klebstoffe, basierend auf amorphen Propylen/Hexen-Copolymeren | [1990/02] | English: | Adhesives based on amorphous propylene/hexene copolymers | [1990/02] | French: | Adhésif à base de copolymères de propylène hexène amorphes | [1990/02] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/37: Verbunden mit 89908050.1/0420935 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 23.07.92 | EPB 1992/37: Consolidated with 89908050.1/0420935 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 23.07.92 | EPB 1992/37: Jointe à la demande no. 89908050.1/0420935 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 23.07.92 | Examination procedure | 21.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 03.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/49] | 26.07.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA856337 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [Y]EP0252718 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [YD]US4178272 (JOYNER FREDERICK B [US], et al) |