EP0371884 - Process for the preparation of dinitrotoluenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doussain, Claude 2, rue Louis Girardet F-69190 Saint-Fons / FR | 02 /
Gubelmann, Michel 39, Boulevard des Belges F-69006 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Popa, Jean-Michel 2, rue Roger Breton F-93700 Drancy / FR | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Varnière-Grange, Monique, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | Varnière-Grange, Monique, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches des Carrières B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420402.3 | 20.10.1989 | [1990/23] | Priority number, date | FR19880014228 | 24.10.1988 Original published format: FR 8814228 | [1990/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0371884 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C205/06, C07C201/08 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
C07C201/08 (EP,US);
C07C201/14 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/08, C07C205/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Dinitrotoluolen | [1990/23] | English: | Process for the preparation of dinitrotoluenes | [1990/23] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dinitrotoluènes | [1990/23] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 16.04.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2400287 (CACSAR GEORGE V); | [A]CH485643 (BOFORS AB [SE]); | [A]FR2202056 (BASF AG [DE]) |