EP0325550 - Electrical urban transport system using automated recharging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parienti, Raoul 5, rue de Belgique 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states Parienti, Raoul 5, rue de Belgique F-06000 Nice / FR | ||
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states Parienti, Raoul 107 avenue Léon Béranger F-06700 Saint Laurent-du-Var / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/30] | Application number, filing date | 89480006.9 | 13.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | FR19880000816 | 18.01.1988 Original published format: FR 8800816 | [1989/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325550 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325550 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
B60K6/00 (EP,US);
B60L53/12 (EP,US);
B60L53/16 (EP);
B60L53/65 (EP);
B60L53/665 (EP);
G07C5/0858 (EP);
G07F15/005 (EP);
G07F17/0014 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/30] | Title | German: | Städtisches, elektrisches Transportsystem mit automatisierter Nachladung | [1989/30] | English: | Electrical urban transport system using automated recharging | [1989/30] | French: | Système de transport urbain électrique à recharge automatisée | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 14.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 22.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Request for further processing for: | 21.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.03.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.02.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   13.03.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.1991 | 31.01.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.1992 | 31.01.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.10.1995 | [2003/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60106302 ; | [X]US4181188 (DESSERT RICHARD [US]); | [A]FR2548808 (BALAGNY FRANCIS [FR]); | [Y]GB2178211 (CITY WHEELS LTD [GB]); | [Y]DE8611058U | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 256 (M-421)[1979], 15 octobre 1985; & JP-A-60 106 302 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 11-06-1985, & JP60106302 A 00000000 |