EP0333613 - Control store address stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funk, Mark Robert 616 Meadow Run Drive Rochester, MN 55902 / US | 02 /
Frye, Harold Eugene 20 Millbank Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12603-5112 / US | 03 /
Petz, Bruce Ralph 2178 17th Street N.E. Rochester MN 55904 / US | 04 /
McMahon, Lynn Allen 2603 24th Street NW Rochester, MN 55901 / US | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Vekemans, André Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | [1989/38] | Application number, filing date | 89480008.5 | 17.01.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | US19880169517 | 17.03.1988 Original published format: US 169517 | [1989/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0333613 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0333613 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F11/22 | [1989/38] | CPC: |
G06F9/3005 (EP,US);
G06F1/10 (EP,US);
G06F11/22 (EP,US);
G06F11/3648 (EP,US);
G06F11/3664 (EP,US);
G06F9/268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/38] | Title | German: | Adressenhalt für Befehlsspeicher | [1989/38] | English: | Control store address stop | [1989/38] | French: | Arrêt sur adresse pour mémoire microprogrammable | [1989/38] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/45] | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4080650 (BECKETT JON TERRY); | [AP]GB2197506 (BURR BROWN LTD) |