EP0400250 - Device for inserting publicity on continuous modular conveyor belts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IAP (INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT PROMOTION) N.V. Van Engelenweg 16/21 Willemstad Curacao / AN | For all designated states Schröder, Heinz-Joachim Ernst Pintor Lopez, 7 E-46003 Valencia / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states IAP (INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT PROMOTION) N.V. Van Engelenweg 16/21 Willemstad, Curacao / AN | ||
For all designated states Schröder, Heinz-Joachim Ernst Pintor Lopez, 7 E-46003 Valencia / ES | |||
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states Münkner, Jürgen Richard Pintor Lopez, 7 E-46003 Valencia / ES | ||
For all designated states Schröder, Heinz-Joachim Ernst Pintor Lopez, 7 E-46003 Valencia / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Münkner, Jurgen Richard Pintor Lopez, 7 E-46003 Valencia / ES | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1992/14] | Kraag, F., Ir. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1990/49] | Sanz-Bermell Martinez, Alejandro Játiva, 4 E-46002 Valencia / ES | Application number, filing date | 89560004.7 | 29.12.1989 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1991/04] |
Former [1990/49] | deleted | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400250 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400250 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400250 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09F19/02, G09F19/22 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
G09F19/02 (EP);
G09F19/22 (EP);
B65G2207/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT, LU, NL [1990/49] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Aufbringen von Werbung auf ununterbrochenene bausteinartige Förderbänder | [1990/49] | English: | Device for inserting publicity on continuous modular conveyor belts | [1990/49] | French: | Dispositif pour l'insertion de publicité sur les bandes transporteuses continues modulaires | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 11.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 26.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.09.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   11.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3881592 ; | [A]GB2044715 |