EP0326504 - Bush type hydraulically damped engine or transmission mount [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gregg, Michael John William 2808 Woodsdale Blvd. Lincoln Nebraska 68502 / US | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg Patent-Department L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [1990/52] |
Former [1989/35] | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [1989/31] | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 89630002.7 | 10.01.1989 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | US19880148467 | 26.01.1988 Original published format: US 148467 | [1989/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326504 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326504 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326504 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00 | [1989/31] | CPC: |
F16F13/1427 (EP,US);
F16F13/00 (KR);
Y10T403/455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/31] | Title | German: | Buchsenartiges hydraulisch gedämpftes Motor- oder Getriebelager | [1989/31] | English: | Bush type hydraulically damped engine or transmission mount | [1989/31] | French: | Support du type à manchon et à amortissement hydraulique pour moteur ou transmission | [1989/31] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 19.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62118131 ; | [A]JP62118132 ; | [XP]EP0278801 (CAOUTCHOUC MANUF PLASTIQUE [FR]); | [A]EP0242254 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 336 (M-638)[2783], 4th November 1987; & JP-A-62 118 131 (BRIDGESTONE CORP.) 29-05-1987, & JP62118131 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 10 (M-446)[2067], 16th January 1986; JP-A-60 172 743 (KINUGAWA GOMU KOGYO K.K.) 06-09-1985 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 336 (M-638)[2783], 4th November 1987; & JP-A-62 118 132 (BRIDGESTONE CORP.) 29-05-1987, & JP62118132 A 00000000 | Examination | US3698703 | US4690389 |