EP0329587 - Gas furnace control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ballard, Gary W. 4630 Ridge Hill Way Plainfield Indiana 46168 / US | 02 /
Dempsey, Daniel J. 812 Bennet Court Carmel Indiana 46032 / US | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 89630027.4 | 14.02.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | US19880156056 | 16.02.1988 Original published format: US 156056 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0329587 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/20, F23N5/24, F23N1/06 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
F24H9/2085 (EP,KR,US);
F27D19/00 (KR);
F23N1/06 (KR);
F23N5/20 (KR);
F23N5/242 (EP,US);
F24H15/128 (EP,KR,US);
F24H15/20 (EP,KR,US);
F24H15/254 (EP,KR,US);
F24H15/31 (EP,KR,US);
F24H15/35 (EP,KR,US);
F24H15/36 (EP,KR,US);
F24H15/414 (EP,KR,US);
F24H15/486 (EP,KR,US);
F23N2223/08 (EP,US);
F23N2225/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/34] | Title | German: | Kontrollverfahren für Gasöfen | [1989/34] | English: | Gas furnace control system | [1989/34] | French: | Système de contrôle pour chaudières à gaz | [1989/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 05.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/49] | 02.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60133219 ; | [A]JP60138326 ; | [X]US4131412 (MATTHEWS RUSSELL B); | [X]NL7907138 (NEOM BV) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 294 (M-431)[2017], 20th November 1985; & JP-A-60 133 219 (MIURA KOGYO K.K.) 16-07-1985, & JP60133219 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 300 (M-433)[2023], 27th November 1985; & JP-A-60 138 326 (NIPPON DENSO K.K.) 23-07-1985, & JP60138326 A 00000000 |