EP0331620 - Agent for the treatment of Parkinson's disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Birkmayer, Walther, Prof. Dr. Schwarzspanierstrasse 15 A-1090 Wien / AT | For all designated states Birkmayer, Jörg, Univ.-Prof. DDr. Schwarzspanierstrasse 15 A-1090 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states Birkmayer, Walther, Prof. Dr. Schwarzspanierstrasse 15 A-1090 Wien / AT | ||
For all designated states Birkmayer, Jörg, Prof.-Dr. Schwarzspanierstrasse 15 A-1090 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Birkmayer, Walther, Prof.Dr. Schwarzspanierstrasse 15 A-1090 Wien / AT | 02 /
Birkmayer, Jörg, Dr. Schwarzspanierstrasse 15 A-1090 Wien / AT | 03 /
Horowski, Reinhard, Dr. Sigismundkorso 52 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 04 /
Wachtel, Helmut, Dr. Suarezstrasse 22 D-1000 Berlin 19 / DE | 05 /
Löschmann, Peter-Andreas Württembergallee 8 D-1000 Berlin 19 / DE | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/12] | Winkler, Andreas, Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89730051.3 | 01.03.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | DE19883807003 | 01.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3807003 | DE19883809024 | 15.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3809024 | [1989/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331620 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331620 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331620 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07H19/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Mittel zur Behandlung des Parkinson-Syndroms | [1989/36] | English: | Agent for the treatment of Parkinson's disease | [1989/36] | French: | Agent pour le traitement de la maladie de Parkinson | [1989/36] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 02.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 11.08.1993 | GR | 11.08.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 11.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - JOURNAL OF NEURO-VISCERAL RELATIONS, Band 31, Suppl. IX, 1969, Seiten 297-308; W. BIRKMAYER: "The Importance of Monoamine Metabolism for the Pathology of the Extrapyramidal System" | [X] - ARCHIV FUER PSYCHIATRIE UND ZEITSCHRIFT F.D. GES. NEUROLOGIE, Band 210, Nr. 1, 1967, Seiten 29-35; W. BIRKMAYER et al.: "Weitere experimentelle Untersuchungen ueber den Catecholaminstoffwechsel bei extrapyramidalen Erkrankungen (Parkinson- und Chorea-Syndrom) | [A] - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, Band 135, Nr. 1, 26. Februar 1986, Seiten 269-275, Academic Press, Inc.; R. RAMSAY et al.: "Inhibition of mitochondrial NADH dehydrogenase by pyridine derivatives and its possible relation to experimental and idiopathic parkinsonism" | [A] - THE LANCET, Band 1 (8369), 1984, Seite 167; J. BLAIR et al.: "Aetiology of Parkinson's disease" | [A] - JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, Band 48, Nr. 3, 1987, Seiten 876-882, International Society for Neurochemistry; M. GRISHAM et al.: "Neuromelanogenic and Cytotoxic Properties of Canine Brainstem Peroxidase" | [A] - JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, Band 49, Nr. 1, 1987, Seiten 1-8, International Society for Neurochemistry; T.P. SINGER et al.: "Biochemical Events in the Development of Parkinsonism Induced by 1-Methyl-4-Phenyl-1,2,3,6-Tetrahydropyridine" | [T] - ANN. CLIN. LAB. SCI., Band 19, nr. 1, Januar-Februar 1989, Seiten 38-43, Institute for Chemical Science, Inc.; W. BIRKMAYER et al.: "Nicotinamidadenindinucleotide (NADH): The New Approach in the Therapy of Parkinson's Disease" |