EP0340153 - N-substituted imidazoles, process for their preparation and their use in medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strehlke, Peter, Dr. Droysenstrasse 10A D-1000 Berlin 12 / DE | 02 /
Bohlmann, Rolf, Dr. Kühler Weg 6a D-1000 Berlin 19 / DE | 03 /
Henderson, David, Dr. Jahnstrasse 17 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 04 /
Nishino, Yukishige, Dr. Lanzendorfer Weg 14 D-1000 Berlin 22 / DE | [1989/44] | Application number, filing date | 89730085.1 | 31.03.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | DE19883811574 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: DE 3811574 | [1989/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0340153 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/60, A61K31/415, C07D233/58 | [1989/44] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/44] | Title | German: | N-substituierte Imidazole, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung in Arzneimitteln | [1989/44] | English: | N-substituted imidazoles, process for their preparation and their use in medicaments | [1989/44] | French: | Imidazoles N-substitués, procédé de leur préparation et leur utilisation en médicaments | [1989/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 11.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2428632 (KISSEI PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]); | [X]EP0003732 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [X]GB2054567 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) |