EP0347367 - Process for producing a vacuum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HWT GESELLSCHAFT FÜR HYDRID- UND WASSERSTOFFTECHNIK MBH Wiesenstrasse 36 D-45473 Mülheim / DE | [1989/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernauer, Otto, Dr., Dipl.-Phys. Zillestrasse 20 D-4130 Moers / DE | 02 /
Keller, Manfred Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Peter-Esser-Dyk 6 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Halene, Clemens Dipl.-Ing. Pigageallee 23 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1989/51] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 89730135.4 | 01.06.1989 | [1989/51] | Priority number, date | DE19883820951 | 16.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3820951 | [1989/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0347367 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0347367 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347367 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F04B37/02, F16L59/06, C01B3/00 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
F04B37/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Vakuums | [1989/51] | English: | Process for producing a vacuum | [1989/51] | French: | Procédé pour créer un vide | [1989/51] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE1539126 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]DE3139368 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) |