EP0356372 - Apparatus for removing a cataract [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/09] | Cataract removal technique | ||
[1994/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anis, Aziz Yehia 9540 Firethorne Lane Lincoln Nebraska 68520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states Anis, Aziz Yehia 9540 Firethorne Lane Lincoln Nebraska 68520 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89730169.3 | 22.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880224579 | 26.07.1988 Original published format: US 224579 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356372 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356372 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356372 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/00 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
A61F9/00736 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/09] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entfernung des grauen Stars | [1994/25] | English: | Apparatus for removing a cataract | [1994/25] | French: | Appareil pour l'extraction de la cataracte | [1994/25] |
Former [1990/09] | Verfahren zur Entfernung des grauen Stars | ||
Former [1990/09] | Cataract removal technique | ||
Former [1990/09] | Technique d'opération de la cataracte | Examination procedure | 27.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Request for further processing for: | 31.03.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH481638 (CAVITRON CORP [US]); | [A]US3937222 (BANKO ANTON); | [Y]GB1577645 (NOVO LAB INC); | [Y]US4428748 (PEYMAN GHOLAM A [US], et al); | [A]US4693245 (PAO DAVID S C [US]) |