EP0375599 - Endoprosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Professional Products GmbH Aspelohe 27a 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Professional Products GmbH Aspelohe 27a D-22848 Norderstedt / DE | ||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states MECRON MEDIZINISCHE PRODUKTE GMBH Nunsdorfer Ring 23-29 D-12277 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kranz, Curt, Dr. Kufsteiner Strasse 12 D-1000 Berlin 62 / DE | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1990/26] | Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45 D-14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 89730225.3 | 20.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883844157 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3844157 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375599 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375599 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375599 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/30 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
A61F2/3662 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/367 (EP,US);
A61F2/3676 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30014 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30324 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30451 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30561 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30708 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30733 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30785 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30795 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30952 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30973 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30975 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3652 (EP,US);
A61F2002/368 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0058 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0018 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0029 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0036 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0071 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Endoprothese | [1990/26] | English: | Endoprosthesis | [1990/26] | French: | Endoprothèse | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.12.1994
28.12.1994
ADMISSIBLE ARTOS Medizinische Produkte GmbH Nunsdorfer Ring 29 D-12277 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Benz, Jürgen E. Merck Patentabteilung Postafch 41 19 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.12.1994
28.12.1994
ADMISSIBLE ARTOS Medizinische Produkte GmbH Nunsdorfer Ring 29 D-12277 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Benz, Jürgen E. Merck Patentabteilung Postafch 41 19 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1996/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.12.1994
28.12.1994
ADMISSIBLE ARTOS Medizinische Produkte GmbH Nunsdorfer Ring 29 D-12277 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Heinze, Ekkehard, Dr. rer. nat., Patentanwalt Luisenstrasse 68 14532 Stahnsdorf / DE | ||
Former [1995/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.12.1994
ARTOS Medizinische Produkte GmbH Nunsdorfer Ring 29 D-12277 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Heinze, Ekkehard Schwedter Str. 49 D-10435 Berlin / DE | 02.01.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.07.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 11.04.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2941265 (TORNIER SA); | [A]DE2933237 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [A]EP0289922 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]) | Examination | - Dubbel Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau, 15. Auflage, Seiten 1070 und 1071; 17. Auflage, Seite C7 |