EP0328486 - Filing tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIELLA-NEHER AG Alexander-Schöni-Strasse 40 CH-2501 Biel / CH | [1989/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohner, Benedikt Russenweg 22 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Bovard, Fritz Albert, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | [1989/33] | Application number, filing date | 89810082.1 | 01.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | CH19880000464 | 09.02.1988 Original published format: CH 46488 | [1989/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0328486 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0328486 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B42F7/12 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
B42F7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | Ablagebehälter | [1989/33] | English: | Filing tray | [1989/33] | French: | Corbeille | [1989/33] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.08.1991 | SE | 21.08.1991 | AT | 01.02.1992 | BE | 28.02.1992 | [1994/18] |
Former [1993/13] | GB | 21.08.1991 | |
SE | 21.08.1991 | ||
BE | 28.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/34] | GB | 21.08.1991 | |
SE | 21.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/13] | SE | 21.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1787387 (CUNO MARZ); | [A]US4456128 (WARSHAW IRWIN [US]); | [A]US4657148 (HENG CHENG K [SG]) |