EP0335829 - Bicycle caliper brake assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAEDA INDUSTRIES, LTD. 97, Tannan Mihara-cho Minamikawachi-gun Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | For all designated states MAEDA INDUSTRIES, LTD. 97, Tannan Mihara-cho Minamikawachi-gun Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishibashi, Yasunori c/o Maeda Indutries, Ltd. 97, Tannan, Mihara-cho Minamikawachi-gun Osaka / JP | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Baggiolini, Raimondo, et al Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi Via San Gottardo 15 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Baggiolini, Raimondo Patent Attorneys, et al Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi Via San Gottardo 15 CH-6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 89810140.7 | 22.02.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | JP19880044416 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: JP 4441688 | [1989/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0335829 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335829 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B62L1/12 | [1989/40] | CPC: |
B62L1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/40] | Title | German: | Fahrradfelgenbremse | [1989/40] | English: | Bicycle caliper brake assembly | [1989/40] | French: | Assemblage d'un frein à mâchoires pour bicyclette | [1989/40] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 18.12.1991 | ES | 18.12.1991 | LI | 18.12.1991 | [2002/24] |
Former [1992/27] | CH | 18.12.1991 | |
LI | 18.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1143998 ; | [A]FR1019440 ; | [AD]JPH06283290 ; | [AD]JPS60136283U |