EP0341206 - Fiber reactive formazane dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | 15.03.1994 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Püntener, Alois, Dr. Pulverweg 13 D-4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 02 /
Lehmann, Urs, Dr. Palmenstrasse 17 D-4055 Basel / CH | 03 /
Scheibli, Peter, Dr. Nussbaumweg 3 D-4103 Bottmingen / CH | 04 /
Koller, Josef Römerstrasse 22 D-4153 Reinach / CH | [1989/45] | Application number, filing date | 89810314.8 | 26.04.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | CH19880001688 | 05.05.1988 Original published format: CH 168888 | [1989/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341206 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/503, C09B67/22, D06P1/384 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
C09B62/5036 (EP,US);
C09B50/00 (KR);
C07F15/00 (KR);
C09B67/0041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/45] | Title | German: | Faserreaktive Formazanfarbstoffe, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung | [1989/45] | English: | Fiber reactive formazane dyes | [1989/45] | French: | Colorants formazane réactifs avec les fibres | [1989/45] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/18] | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0114032 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0210951 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |