EP0377402 - Potassium niobate crystals and method for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/28] | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Günter, Peter Püntstrasse 17 CH-8173 Riedt/Neerach / CH | [1990/28] | Application number, filing date | 89810814.7 | 31.10.1989 | [1990/28] | Priority number, date | DE19883837672 | 05.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3837672 | [1990/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0377402 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0377402 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0377402 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/30, C30B17/00 | [1990/28] | CPC: |
C30B15/00 (EP,US);
C30B29/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/28] | Title | German: | Kaliumniobat-Kristalle und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1990/28] | English: | Potassium niobate crystals and method for their preparation | [1990/28] | French: | Cristaux de niobate de potassium et procédé de préparation | [1990/28] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3565577 [ ] (PULUKA JOHN F, et al) | Examination | US5034949 | - JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, vol. 43, no. 4, May 1978, pages 406-416, North-Holland Publisching Company, Amsterdam, NL; U. FLÜCKINGER et al. :"On the preparation of pure, doped and reeeduced KNbO3 single crystals" | - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol.11, no.2, February 1978, Tokyo, JP; T. FUKUDA et al.:"Preeparation of KNbO3 single crystal for optical applications" | - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 64, no.1, November 1, 1988, pages 4668-4673, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; C. MEDRANO et al. :"Optimization of the photorefractive properties of KNbO3 crystals " | - MAT. RES. BULL., vol. 21, 1986, pages 1375-1382, Pergamon Journals Ltd., US; S. DEZHONG: "On the perparation of large, single domain KNbO3 crystals" |